Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/21/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/03/2010