Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/14/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 01/14/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/14/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/14/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/26/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/26/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/26/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/27/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/27/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 01/27/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/27/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/28/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/28/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/04/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/04/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/04/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/11/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/11/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/11/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/26/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/05/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/10/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/12/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/23/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/23/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/23/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/23/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/24/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/02/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/21/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/13/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/13/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/19/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/19/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/21/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/16/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/26/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/13/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/14/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/28/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/28/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/15/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/13/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/13/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/20/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/20/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/18/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/18/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/18/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/18/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/11/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/16/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/16/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/12/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/12/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/02/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/09/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/28/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/08/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/08/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/21/2010