Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/23/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/23/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/23/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/23/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/23/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/23/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/23/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/23/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/23/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/23/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/01/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/01/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/01/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/01/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/26/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/26/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/26/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/26/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/26/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/26/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/26/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/26/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/26/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/26/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/30/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/16/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/16/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/16/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/16/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/29/2010