Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/20/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/20/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/20/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/20/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/21/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/21/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/22/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/22/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/26/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/26/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/26/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/26/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/26/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/26/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/29/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/29/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/29/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/04/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/04/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/04/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/05/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/05/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/06/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/12/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/12/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/12/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/12/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/12/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/12/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/12/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/18/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/18/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/19/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/24/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/26/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/27/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/08/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/08/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/08/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/08/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/10/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/14/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/14/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/21/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/21/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/30/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/15/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/26/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/28/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/29/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/20/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/23/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/02/2010