Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/15/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/15/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/15/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/22/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/03/2010