Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/20/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/21/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/05/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/20/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/27/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/14/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/14/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/14/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/14/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/22/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/23/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/29/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 06/30/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/30/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/01/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/01/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/01/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/01/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/13/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/13/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/14/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/15/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/21/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/21/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/22/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/10/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/29/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/16/2010