There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SEAM Act of 2010
Security in Energy and Manufacturing Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the qualifying advanced energy project credit.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/15/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/15/2010Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (99)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/15/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/05/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/11/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/12/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/12/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/18/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/20/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/27/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/08/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/14/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/14/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/21/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/20/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/21/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/28/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/15/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5041. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/15/2010)

Security in Energy and Manufacturing Act of 2010 or the SEAM Act of 2010 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to expand the qualifying advanced energy project credit by allocating in 2010 $5 billion of grants or tax credit amounts to manufacturers of goods and components (other than for assembly of components) in the United States that are used in alternative energy projects.