Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/15/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/05/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/11/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/12/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/12/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/18/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/20/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/27/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/08/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/14/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/14/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/21/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/20/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/21/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/28/2010