Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/29/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/06/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/21/2010