There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Marine Turtle Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2009

Short Titles as Reported to House

Marine Turtle Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Marine Turtle Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2009

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Marine Turtle Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To reauthorize the Marine Turtle Conservation Act of 2004, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Marine Turtle Conservation Act of 2004.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
04/26/2010Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 111-173.
07/28/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 354 - 72 (Roll no. 652).(text: CR 7/27/2009 H8831)
07/10/2009Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-200.
01/14/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/26/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 356.
04/26/2010SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 111-173.
12/10/2009SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
12/03/2009SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife
07/29/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
07/28/2009-6:06pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/28/2009-6:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/28/2009-6:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 354 - 72 (Roll no. 652). (text: CR 7/27/2009 H8831)
07/28/2009-5:59pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8934-8935)
07/27/2009-3:34pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Bordallo objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
07/27/2009-3:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 509.
07/27/2009-3:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8831-8832)
07/27/2009-3:32pmHouseMs. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/10/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 107.
07/10/2009HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-200.
06/10/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/10/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/10/2009HouseSubcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife Discharged.
05/05/2009HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife
02/04/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/14/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/14/2009HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E83)
01/14/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/14/2009 Referred to
06/10/2009 Markup by
07/10/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-200
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Insular Affairs02/04/2009 Referred to
05/05/2009 Hearings by
06/10/2009 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works07/29/2009 Referred to
12/10/2009 Markup by
04/26/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-173

No related bill information was received for H.R.509.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.509. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (04/26/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on July 10, 2009. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Marine Turtle Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2009 - Expands marine turtle conservation assistance under the Marine Turtle Conservation Act of 2004 to include the United States and its territories. Authorizes appropriations to the Marine Turtle Conservation Fund for FY2009-FY2014. Authorizes an increase in the amount available from the Fund for administrative expenses. Limits funds made available for projects relating to the conservation of marine turtles in the United States to no more than 20% of the Fund for any fiscal year.