Committees: H.R.509 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/14/2009 Referred to
06/10/2009 Markup by
07/10/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-200
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Insular Affairs02/04/2009 Referred to
05/05/2009 Hearings by
06/10/2009 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works07/29/2009 Referred to
12/10/2009 Markup by
04/26/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-173