Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/17/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/31/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/01/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/05/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/12/2009