Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/27/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/28/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/08/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/09/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/17/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/19/2010