There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protect Medical Innovation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the excise tax on medical devices.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/21/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/21/2010Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/21/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/21/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/26/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/26/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/19/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/27/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/29/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/29/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/29/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/21/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5095.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5095. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/21/2010)

Protect Medical Innovation Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal the excise tax on medical device manufacturers and importers (established by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act [PPACA]).