Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/14/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 01/21/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/21/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/22/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/22/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 01/22/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 01/26/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 01/27/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/03/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/10/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/10/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/11/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/11/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/17/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/17/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/17/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/24/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/24/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 03/31/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/05/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/05/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/05/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/13/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/13/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/19/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/25/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/15/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/15/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/15/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/15/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/28/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/28/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/31/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/10/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/23/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/25/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/01/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/27/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/29/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/17/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/15/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/29/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/05/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/10/2010