Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/22/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/22/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/27/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/27/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/27/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/06/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/06/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/06/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/06/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/11/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/11/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/13/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/13/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/20/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/20/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/25/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/25/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/28/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/10/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/10/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/10/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/10/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/30/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/21/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/21/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/28/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 08/10/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/17/2010
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/17/2010