Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/22/2010