Refine your search

Showing 10 of 10 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
01/04/2011 Became Public Law No: 111-358.
01/04/2011 Signed by President.
12/28/2010 Presented to President.
12/21/2010 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 130 (Roll no. 659).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8824-8841)
12/17/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2010 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/28/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 262 - 150 (Roll no. 332).
05/07/2010 Committee on Education and Labor discharged.
05/07/2010 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science and Technology. H. Rept. 111-478, Part I.
04/22/2010 Introduced in House