There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Education for All Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to provide assistance for developing countries to promote quality basic education and to establish the achievement of universal basic education in all developing countries as an objective of United States foreign assistance policy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/22/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/22/2010Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/22/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/28/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/28/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/28/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/06/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/13/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/13/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/27/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/27/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/27/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/10/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/10/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/24/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/24/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/24/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/24/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/24/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/24/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/24/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/24/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/24/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/24/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/01/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/01/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/29/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/29/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 08/10/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 11/16/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/21/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/22/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5117. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/22/2010)

Education for All Act of 2010 - Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to state that it is U.S. policy to work with foreign countries and international and civil society organizations to achieve universal basic education by: (1) assisting developing countries and nongovernmental and multilateral organizations to provide all children with a quality basic education; and (2) promoting education as the foundation for communities' development.

Directs the President to develop a comprehensive U.S. strategy to promote universal basic education by 2015.

Authorizes the President to provide funds and other assistance to qualifying foreign countries to create the policies, processes, and infrastructure to develop national basic education plans.

Amends the State Department Basic Authorities Act of 1956 to establish within the Department of State a Coordinator of United States Government Activities to Provide Basic Education Assistance who shall shall have primary responsibility for the oversight and coordination of all U.S. government resources and international activities to promote universal basic education.