Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/06/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/13/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/13/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/24/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/24/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/24/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/21/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/21/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/20/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/29/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/29/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/16/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/16/2010