Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/26/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/04/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/04/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/19/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/19/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/19/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/27/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/01/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/15/2010