Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/26/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/26/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/26/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/28/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/04/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/11/2010