Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/04/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/26/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/10/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/16/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/16/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/16/2010