Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/28/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/28/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/28/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/28/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/04/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/04/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/04/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/04/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/04/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/04/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/04/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/04/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/11/2010