Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
01/04/2011 Became Public Law No: 111-359.
01/04/2011 Signed by President.
12/28/2010 Presented to President.
12/16/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10365-10366; text as passed Senate: CR S10365)
12/16/2010 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/09/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 346).(text: CR H4267)
04/22/2010 Introduced in House