There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Girls Protection Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to provide penalties for transporting minors in foreign commerce for the purposes of female genital mutilation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/26/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/15/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/26/2010Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (156)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/26/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/05/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/05/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/05/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/05/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/05/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/05/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/05/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/05/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/05/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/05/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/05/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/05/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/05/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/05/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/05/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/05/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/18/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/20/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/20/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/20/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/20/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/20/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/20/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/20/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/20/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/20/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/20/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/20/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/20/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 05/20/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/20/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/20/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/20/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/20/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/26/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/26/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/22/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/22/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/30/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/19/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/19/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/21/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/21/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/21/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/26/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/28/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/28/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/28/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 08/09/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/29/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/30/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/26/2010 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/15/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5137.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5137. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/26/2010)

Girls Protection Act of 2010 - Amends the federal criminal code to impose a fine or five-year prison term, or both, on any U.S. citizen or alien admitted for permanent residence who knowingly transports in foreign commerce a girl under the age of 18 for the purposes of female genital mutilation.