Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/26/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/05/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/05/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/05/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/05/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/05/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/05/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/05/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/05/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/05/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/05/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/05/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/05/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/05/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/05/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/05/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/05/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/18/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/20/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/20/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/20/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/20/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/20/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/20/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/20/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/20/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/20/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/20/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/20/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/20/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 05/20/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/20/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/20/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/20/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/20/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/26/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/26/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/22/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/22/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/30/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/19/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/19/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/21/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/21/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/21/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/26/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/28/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/28/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/28/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 08/09/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/29/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/30/2010