There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Grow a Renewable Energy Economy Now--Jumpstart Other Biofuels Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for an investment tax credit for biofuel facilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/26/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
12/21/2010-1:37pmRule H. Res. 1781 passed House.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/21/2010-12:35pmRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1781 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5116, H.R. 2751 and H.R. 5142. Providing for consideration of the Senate amendment to H.R. 5116, consideration of the Senate amendments to H.R. 2751, and consideration of the Senate amendment H.R. 2142
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2010Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 04/26/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/26/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/28/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/28/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/04/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/04/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/04/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/05/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/06/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/06/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/25/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/26/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/28/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/08/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/23/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/24/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/26/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5142. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/26/2010)

Grow a Renewable Energy Economy Now--Jumpstart Other Biofuels Act of 2010 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) allow a 30% energy tax credit for investments in qualified cellulosic and algae-based biofuel facilities; (2) extend through 2016 the special depreciation allowance for qualified cellulosic biofuel plant property; (3) include algae-based biofuel within the definition of cellulosic biofuel for purposes of the cellulosic biofuel producer tax credit; (4) exclude from the definition of cellulosic biofuel any processed fuel with an acid number greater than 25; (5) extend through 2016 the cellulosic biofuel producer tax credit; and (6) allow a direct payment of 30% of the basis of cellulosic and algae-based biofuel facility property.