Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 04/26/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/26/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/28/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/28/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/04/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/04/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/04/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/05/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/06/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/06/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/25/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/26/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/28/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/08/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/23/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/24/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/2010