There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Criminal Justice Commission Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

National Criminal Justice Commission Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the National Criminal Justice Commission.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/27/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6129-6131)
04/27/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
08/05/2010SenateRead twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 514.
07/28/2010SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/27/2010-6:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/27/2010-6:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6129-6131)
07/27/2010-6:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5143.
07/27/2010-6:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6129-6133)
07/27/2010-6:34pmHouseMr. Scott (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/15/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/27/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
04/27/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/27/2010 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/15/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5143. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/27/2010)

National Criminal Justice Commission Act of 2010 - Establishes the National Criminal Justice Commission to undertake a comprehensive review of all areas of the criminal justice system, including federal, state, local, and tribal governments' criminal justice costs, practices, and policies.

Directs the Commission to: (1) make findings regarding its review and recommendations for changes in oversight, policies, practices, and laws designed to prevent, deter, and reduce crime and violence, reduce recidivism, improve cost-effectiveness, and ensure the interests of justice; (2) conduct public hearings in various locations around the United States; (3) consult with federal, state, local, and tribal government and nongovernmental leaders and other stakeholders in the criminal justice system, including the U.S. Sentencing Commission; and (4) submit a final report, within 18 months after its first meeting, to Congress, the President, and state, local, and tribal governments, and make such report available to the public.

Expresses the sense of Congress that the Commission should work toward unanimously supported findings and recommendations.

Sets forth the membership composition of the Commission and its administrative provisions.

Exempts the Commission from the Federal Advisory Committee Act.

Requires all records and papers of the Commission to be deposited into the National Archives.

Authorizes appropriations for FY2011-2012.

Terminates the Commission 60 days after it submits its report to Congress.

Provides for compliance of the budgetary effects of this Act with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010.