Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/22/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 01/22/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/22/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/22/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/22/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/22/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/22/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 01/22/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/22/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/22/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 01/22/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/22/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/22/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/22/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 01/22/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/27/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/27/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/27/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/27/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/28/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/28/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/28/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/04/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/04/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/04/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/04/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/04/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/04/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 02/12/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/12/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/12/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/12/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/12/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/06/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/19/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/13/2009