Text: H.R.5156 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (08/05/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 5156


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

July 29, 2010

Received

August 5, 2010

Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation


AN ACT

To provide for the establishment of a Clean Energy Technology Manufacturing and Export Assistance Fund to assist United States businesses with exporting clean energy technology products and services.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Clean Energy Technology Manufacturing and Export Assistance Act of 2010”.

SEC. 2. Clean Energy Technology Manufacturing and Export Assistance Fund.

(a) Definitions.—For purposes of this section—

(1) the term “clean energy technology” means a technology related to the production, use, transmission, storage, control, or conservation of energy that will contribute to a stabilization of atmospheric greenhouse gas concentrations through reduction, avoidance, or sequestration of energy-related emissions and—

(A) reduce the need for additional energy supplies by using existing energy supplies with greater efficiency or by transmitting, distributing, or transporting energy with greater effectiveness through the infrastructure of the United States; or

(B) diversify the sources of energy supply of the United States to strengthen energy security and to increase supplies with a favorable balance of environmental effects if the entire technology system is considered; and

(2) the term “Secretary” means the Secretary of Commerce.

(b) Establishment.—The Secretary shall establish a Clean Energy Technology Manufacturing and Export Assistance Fund, to be administered through the International Trade Administration. The Secretary shall administer the Fund to promote policies that will reduce production costs and encourage innovation, investment, and productivity in the clean energy technology sector, and implement a national clean energy technology export strategy. The purpose of the Fund is to ensure that United States clean energy technology firms, including clean energy technology parts suppliers and engineering and design firms, have the information and assistance they need to be competitive and create clean energy technology sector jobs in the United States.

(c) Assistance.—The Secretary, consistent with the National Export Initiative, shall provide information, tools, and other assistance to United States businesses to promote clean energy technology manufacturing and facilitate the export of clean energy technology products and services. Such assistance shall include—

(1) developing critical analysis of policies to reduce production costs and promote innovation, investment, and productivity in the clean energy technology sector;

(2) helping educate companies about how to tailor their activities to specific markets with respect to their product slate, financing, marketing, assembly, and logistics;

(3) helping United States companies learn about the export process and export opportunities in foreign markets;

(4) helping United States companies to navigate foreign markets; and

(5) helping United States companies provide input regarding clean energy technology manufacturing and trade policy developments and trade promotion.

(d) Reports to Congress.—

(1) Not later than 180 days after the date of enactment of this Act, the Secretary shall transmit to the Congress a report indicating how the funds provided under this section will be used to—

(A) focus on small and medium-sized United States businesses;

(B) encourage the creation and maintenance of the greatest number of clean energy technology jobs in the United States; and

(C) encourage the domestic production of clean energy technology products and services, including materials, components, equipment, parts, and supplies related in any way to the product or service.

(2) Not later than January 1, 2015, the Secretary shall transmit to the Congress a report assessing the extent to which the program established under this section—

(A) has been successful in developing critical analysis of policies to reduce production costs and promote innovation, investment, and productivity in the clean energy technology sector;

(B) has been successful in increasing the competitiveness of United States clean energy technology firms in emerging markets;

(C) has been successful in assisting United States businesses, specifically small and medium-sized firms, with exporting clean energy technology products and services;

(D) has been successful in creating jobs directly related to the clean energy technology sector in the United States, including specific information as to the nature, location, and duration of those jobs and the methodology used by the Secretary to compile such information;

(E) has been successful in helping United States companies provide input regarding clean energy technology manufacturing and trade policy developments and trade promotion; and

(F) should be continued.

(e) Authorization of appropriations.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—There are authorized to be appropriated to the Secretary for carrying out this section $15,000,000 for each of the fiscal years 2011 through 2015.

(2) LIMITATION.—No assistance provided using funds appropriated pursuant to this section shall be provided in the form of a monetary grant.

Passed the House of Representatives July 28, 2010.

    Attest: lorraine c. miller,   
    Clerk.