Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/06/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/24/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/10/2010