Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/04/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/13/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/18/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/16/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/16/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/27/2010