Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/11/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/11/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/11/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/11/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/11/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/11/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/11/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/11/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/11/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/11/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/11/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/11/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/11/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/11/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/11/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/11/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/11/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/11/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/11/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/11/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/11/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/12/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/12/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/13/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/13/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/14/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/20/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/25/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/25/2010