Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/13/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/13/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/10/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/16/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/01/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/28/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/28/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/28/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/13/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/13/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/18/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/08/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/14/2010