Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/13/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/15/2009