Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 05/04/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/12/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/18/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/18/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/23/2010