Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/06/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/12/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/24/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/08/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/01/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/15/2010