There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Big Oil Bailout Prevention Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require oil polluters to pay the full cost of oil spills, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/05/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/06/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/06/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/05/2010Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/05/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (85)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/06/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/11/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/11/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/11/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/13/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/18/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/20/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/20/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/24/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/24/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/24/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/24/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/26/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/26/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/26/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/26/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/26/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/28/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/28/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/08/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/08/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/10/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/15/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/16/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/23/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/01/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/27/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/05/2010 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation05/06/2010 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment05/06/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5214. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/05/2010)

Big Oil Bailout Prevention Act of 2010 - Amends the Oil Pollution Act of 1990 to: (1) increase the liability of the party responsible for an offshore facility, except a deepwater port, from which oil is discharged into or upon navigable waters or adjoining shorelines to the total of all discharge removal costs plus $10 billion (currently, $75 million) for each incident; and (2) direct the President to promulgate regulations to allow advance payments from the Oil Spill Liability Trust Fund to states and localities to prepare for and mitigate substantial threats from the discharge of oil.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to eliminate: (1) the $1 billion per incident limitation on expenditures from the Oil Spill Liability Trust Fund for cleanup of oil spills: and (2) restrictions on the borrowing authority of such Trust Fund.

Makes this Act effective on April 15, 2010.