Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/06/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/11/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/11/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/11/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/13/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/18/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/20/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/20/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/24/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/24/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/24/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/24/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/26/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/26/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/26/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/26/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/26/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/28/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/28/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/08/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/08/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/10/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/15/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/16/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/23/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/01/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/27/2010