Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/12/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/20/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/08/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/16/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/21/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/24/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/28/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/28/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/29/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/19/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/29/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/18/2010