Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/08/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/28/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/29/2010