Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/06/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/12/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/12/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/12/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/12/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/19/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/19/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/19/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/19/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/19/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/19/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/19/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/19/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/17/2010