Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/24/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/09/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/22/2010