Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/19/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/26/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/26/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/09/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/29/2010