Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/26/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/26/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/27/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/27/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/03/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/04/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/12/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2009