Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/11/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/11/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/11/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/19/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/19/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/19/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/19/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/19/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/19/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/30/2010