Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/27/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/28/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/17/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/01/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/20/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/20/2010