There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Tax Information for New Fiscal Oversight Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Joint Committee on Taxation to analyze each tax expenditure identified in its annual tax expenditure report for equity, efficiency, and ease of administration.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/12/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/12/2010Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/12/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/19/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/26/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/30/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/12/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5291.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5291. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/12/2010)

Tax Information for New Fiscal Oversight Act of 2010 - Directs the Joint Committee on Taxation, beginning with its 2011 annual tax expenditure report, to: (1) analyze each tax expenditure identified in such report for its equity, efficiency, and ease of administration; and (2) reflect in such report the aggregate annual revenue lost due to such tax expenditures.